United States of America v. Heirs and Devisees of Ruth L. Toth et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF RUTH L. TOTH, DECEASED; and LYNN A. BECCUE, Lynn A Beccue and Heirs and Devisees of
Case Number: 4:2019cv00099
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION for Service by Publication and ORDERING that this Order be published in a newspaper of general circulation in Jasper County, Indiana, once a week for six consecutive weeks, beginning no later than 28 days from the date of this Order. The Court ORDERS Defendants Heirs and Devisees of Ruth L. Toth, to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint within 28 days of the last date of publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/12/2019. (bas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo United States of America. Lynn A Beccue served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (nal)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lynn A Beccue. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
October 28, 2019 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (shk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF RUTH L. TOTH, DECEASED; and LYNN A. BECCUE, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Heirs and Devisees of Ruth L. Toth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF RUTH L. TOTH, DECEASED; and LYNN A. BECCUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn A Beccue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Devisees of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?