Glynn v. Cigar Cigar LLC
Plaintiff: Bryan Glynn
Defendant: Cigar Cigar LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00022
Filed: March 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bryan Glynn (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff to file dismissal papers by 5/27/2020 re #3 Notice of Settlement. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/27/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
April 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Settlement by Bryan Glynn (Liebowitz, Richard)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cigar Cigar LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
March 30, 2020 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (rmf)
March 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cigar Cigar LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4185188.), filed by Bryan Glynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glynn v. Cigar Cigar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Glynn
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigar Cigar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?