Henson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patricia Henson
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00045
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONSENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Joshua P Kolar (kjp)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM on behalf of Patricia Henson; Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (mlc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/21/2020. (tc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Patricia Henson.(Forbes, Rodney)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (text entry only) granting #9 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by plaintiff, noting that Plaintiff can do so as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). Plaintiff is ordered to file her Amended Complaint upon receipt of this order. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/18/20. (efc)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Patricia Henson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Forbes, Rodney)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmf)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 , WAIVES payment of the filing fee, and DIRECTS, the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/16/2020. (Sent to USM) (rmf)
June 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. *NEW CASE; MOTION PENDING* (lhc)
June 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Patricia Henson. (Forbes, Rodney)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E Forbes on behalf of Patricia Henson (Forbes, Rodney)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Patricia Henson Civil Coversheet (Forbes, Rodney)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E Forbes on behalf of Patricia Henson (Forbes, Rodney) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #5 *** Modified on 6/15/2020 (ace).
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons filed by Patricia Henson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Rodney)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Patricia Henson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Forbes, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Henson
Represented By: Rodney E Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?