Meyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Timothy Meyer
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00049
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C Hinsley on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hinsley, Jay)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Office of Regional Chief Counsel Reg V on 07/17/20, filed by Timothy Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Forbes, Rodney)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Socil Security Administration United States Attorney Northern District of Indiana on 07/13/20, filed by Timothy Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Forbes, Rodney)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on United States Attorney General Social Security Administration on 07/15/20, filed by Timothy Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Forbes, Rodney)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (mlc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2020: #1 CORRECTED SUMMONS) (mlc).
July 6, 2020 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (mlc)
July 6, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 4000458 (mlc)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Meyer; GRANTING the plaintiff until 7/23/2020 to pay the $400.00 filing fee; and CAUTIONING the plaintiff if there is no response by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 6/22/2020. (lhc)
June 18, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty added. (NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING) (mlc)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Meyer. (Forbes, Rodney)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E Forbes on behalf of Timothy Meyer (Forbes, Rodney)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Timothy Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jay C Hinsley
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Meyer
Represented By: Rodney E Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?