Pavlov v. Lafayette City of et al
Plaintiff: Gorgi Pavlov
Defendant: Tippecanoe County Sheriff, Samuel T Gawaluck, Lafayette City of Police Department, Lafayette City of and Michael D Sears
Case Number: 4:2020cv00069
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and ORDERS that the deadline for Defendants to file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 11/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/8/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gorgi Pavlov. Tippecanoe County Sheriff served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (mlc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gorgi Pavlov. Michael D Sears served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (mlc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gorgi Pavlov. Samuel T Gawaluck served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (mlc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gorgi Pavlov. Lafayette City of served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (mlc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Defendants Samuel T Gawaluck, Lafayette City of, Lafayette City of Police Department, Michael D Sears. (Pollack, Caren)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Caren L Pollack on behalf of Samuel T Gawaluck, Lafayette City of, Lafayette City of Police Department, Michael D Sears (Pollack, Caren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Samuel T Gawaluck, Lafayette City of, Lafayette City of Police Department, Michael D Sears, Tippecanoe County Sheriff. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Samuel T Gawaluck, Lafayette City of, Lafayette City of Police Department, Michael D Sears, Tippecanoe County Sheriff (Filing fee $ 400.00.) Receipt #4000462, filed by Gorgi Pavlov. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pavlov v. Lafayette City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tippecanoe County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel T Gawaluck
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City of Police Department
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City of
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Sears
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gorgi Pavlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?