Koning v. ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan et al
Plaintiff: CAROL KONING
Defendant: ACELL, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan
Case Number: 4:2021cv00043
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bengs, Tina)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Bengs, Tina)
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2021 11:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/23/2021. (tc)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: As the Notice #13 NOTICE by Carol Koning Joint Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) as to Defendant Acell, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan Only meets the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), it is GRANTED and the claims against Defendant Acell, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The claims against Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company REMAIN PENDING. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 8/4/2021. (lhc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Carol Koning Joint Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) as to Defendant Acell, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan Only (Davidson, Melissa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan ; answer due by August 30, 2021. (Rasp, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Rasp on behalf of ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan (Rasp, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/30/2021. (tc)
July 30, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company answer due 8/30/2021. (mlc)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company ; answer due by August 30, 2021. (Bengs, Tina)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.. (Bengs, Tina)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina M Bengs on behalf of United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Bengs, Tina)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Koning. ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Davidson, Melissa)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Koning. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Davidson, Melissa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan, United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
July 9, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (mlc)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley D Marks on behalf of CAROL KONING (Marks, Ashley)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Davidson on behalf of CAROL KONING (Davidson, Melissa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACELL, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4622966.), filed by CAROL KONING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Davidson, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koning v. ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL KONING
Represented By: Ashley D Marks
Represented By: Melissa A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACELL, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Tina M Bengs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACell Inc Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Kevin C Rasp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?