Hustedt v. Hunter Warfield Inc
Plaintiff: Alexandra Hustedt
Defendant: HUNTER WARFIELD, INC. and Hunter Warfield Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00059
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 Amended MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION filed by Hunter Warfield Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint by Hunter Warfield Inc.(Watts, Patrick)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motion to Remand for Lack of Article III Jurisdiction #15 #28 and ORDERS that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand for Lack of Article III Jurisdiction #15 is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/13/2021. (mrm)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of #29 Amended MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION filed by Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Amended MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw #15 MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alexandra Hustedt re #26 Amended Complaint (Keller, Duran)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hunter Warfield Inc, filed by Alexandra Hustedt.(Keller, Duran)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt and ORDERING Plaintiff to file the Amended Complaint, currently on the docket as an attachment to the instant Motion, on or before 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/12/2021. (mrm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Attachments: #1 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Keller, Duran)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply to be filed by 10/22/2021. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/01/2021. No pdf attached. (djs)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motion to StrikePortions of Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses #10 #20 and ORDERS that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Certain Affirmative Defenses #10 is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/29/2021. (bas)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw #10 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Amended Complaint due to filing of Amended Answer by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION filed by Hunter Warfield Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Hunter Warfield Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Hunter Warfield Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION filed by Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 **WITHDRAWN PER DE ORDER #31 ** MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF ARTICLE III JURISDICTION by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran) Modified on 10/13/2021 to Withdraw (mrm).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/13/2021. (smb)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 9/13/2021. (bas)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Alexandra Hustedt. (Keller, Duran)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 *WITHDRAWN pursuant to DE #21 Order dated 9/29/2021* MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Alexandra Hustedt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #2 Exhibit Letter to Defendant's Counsel, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Keller, Duran) Modified on 9/29/2021 (bas).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Hunter Warfield Inc.(Watts, Patrick)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Reynold T Berry ORDERED WITHDRAWN. Attorney Patrick Watts remains counsel for Hunter Warfield, Inc. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/2/2021. (smb)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Hunter Warfield Inc. (Berry, Reynold)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A Watts on behalf of Hunter Warfield Inc (Watts, Patrick)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUNTER WARFIELD, INC. identifying Corporate Parent HWI Holding, Inc. for HUNTER WARFIELD, INC... (Berry, Reynold)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Reynold T Berry on behalf of HUNTER WARFIELD, INC. (Berry, Reynold)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4671383.) from Tippecanoe Circuit Court, Cause No. 79C01-2106-CT-000084, filed by HUNTER WARFIELD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket and Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Reynold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hustedt v. Hunter Warfield Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Hustedt
Represented By: Duran L Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER WARFIELD, INC.
Represented By: Reynold T Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Warfield Inc
Represented By: Patrick A Watts
Represented By: Reynold T Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?