Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al v. Meade et al
Plaintiff: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company and Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Defendant: Marquitta Meade, Lesley Meade, Laurence Meade, Lance Meade, Millicent Meade, Estate of Martha M. Meade and Martha M. Meade
Case Number: 4:2022cv00027
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Millicent Meade. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court hereby STRIKES the Answer to Complaint-in-Interpleader filed by Counsel Lesley Meade on behalf of Lesley Meade, individually, Lesley Meade, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Marth M. Meade, Millicent Meade, and Laurence Meade DE #9 , with leave for Lesley Meade to refile an Answer on behalf of Lesley Meade, individually, only, by 06/20/2022. The Court REMINDS the parties that the Estate must have counsel, although all other Defendants may appear pro se, and all of the defendants have been given until 07/26/2022, to file an appearance in this case, either individually or by counsel. The Court also REMINDS the parties that this matter is set for status on 08/04/2022, at 11:00 a.m. (Central Time). Parties and pro se litigants are instructed to dial 877-873-8017 and enter access code 5155509# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 06/09/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(sej)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Proposed Summons filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company. (Hall, Angela)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company of Service on Marquitta Meade (Hall, Angela)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company of Service on Lesley Meade (Hall, Angela)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company of Service on Laurence Meade (Hall, Angela)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company of Service on Lance Meade (Hall, Angela)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held 6/9/2022 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla(s) appeared by attys Angela Hall, Liam Williams. Dfts Marquitta Meade and Lance Meade appeared pro se. Dft Lesley Meade appeared pursuant to an appearance filed on his own behalf. Attorney Lesley Meade's appearance on behalf of the Estate of Martha Meade, Laurence Meade, and Millicent Meade is WITHDRAWN as the Court rules will not allow him to represent both himself and other defendants. Court gives additional time for the Estate and all pro se defendants to retain counsel. Discovery STAYED. Parties are not to file or exchange any discovery in the interim. Counsel for Pla is directed to issue summons or waiver of service as to Dft Lance Meade, and file return of summons as to all applicable defendants. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/4/2022 11:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin which will require the appearance of all parties and pro se litigants. Parties and pro se litigants are instructed to dial 877-873-8017 and enter access code 5155509# when prompted. (#FTR.) (cc: all pro se litigants as listed on the docket by first class mail)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Marquitta L Meade by Marquitta Meade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(mlc)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT (review of facts) of Lance M Meade by Lance Meade. (mlc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court STRIKES Defendant Marquitta Meade's Letter #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/1/22. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 *STRICKEN pursuant to #16 Order* Letter from Marquitta Meade regarding subpoenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Copy of Subpoena) (ksp) Modified to strike per order on 6/1/2022 (nhc).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STRIKING #12 and #13 NOTICES of Request for Subpoena by Marquitta Meade as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/23/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(asd)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 *STRICKEN pursuant to #14 Order* NOTICE of Request for Subpoena by Marquitta Meade (mlc) Modified on 5/23/2022 (asd).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 *STRICKEN pursuant to #14 Order* NOTICE of Request for Subpoena by Marquitta Meade (mlc) Modified on 5/23/2022 (asd).
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/9/2022 12:30 PM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties are instructed to dial 877-873-8017 and enter access code 5155509# when prompted. The Court ORDERS Marquitta Meade, a pro se party, to call in for the conference in addition to all counsel of record. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/10/2022. (cc: pro se party)(smb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/9/2022. (smb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *STRICKEN pursuant to #26 Order* ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, by Laurence Meade, Lesley Meade, Millicent Meade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Meade, Lesley) Modified on 6/10/2022 (sej).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Marquitta Meade.(mlc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2022: #1 ANSWER, #2 Exhibit) (mlc).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A Meade on behalf of Estate of Martha M. Meade, Laurence Meade. (ksp) Modified on 6/9/2022 to show Lesley A. Meades appearance withdrawn on behalf of Estate of Martha M. Meade and Laurence Meade as represented in Court's minutes of 6/9/2022. (smb).
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lance Meade, Laurence Meade, Lesley Meade, Marquitta Meade, Millicent Meade. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Laurence, #2 Lesley, #3 Marquitta, #4 Millicent)(asd)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (asd)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Hall, Angela)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Hall, Angela)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Williams on behalf of Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company (Williams, Liam)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT -in-Interpleader against Estate of Martha M. Meade, Lance Meade, Laurence Meade, Lesley Meade, Marquitta Meade, Millicent Meade( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4890151.), filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons of Marquitta Meade, #3 Proposed Summons of Lesley Meade, #4 Proposed Summons of Laurence Meade, #5 Proposed Summons of Lance Meade, #6 Proposed Summons of Millicent Meade)(Hall, Angela)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Kelver Hall on behalf of Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Protective Life Insurance Company (Hall, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al v. Meade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: Liam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: Liam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: Liam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquitta Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Meade
Represented By: Lesley A Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millicent Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Martha M. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha M. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?