Honkisz v. MVS Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HONKISZ
Defendant: MVS TRANSPORT, LLC, R&L FREIGHT, LLC, GERSON MOLINA GUEVARA, MVS Transport LLC and R&L Freight
Case Number: 4:2022cv00080
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/8/2022, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty Todd Schafer. Dfts appeared by atty Lesley Pfleging. The Report filed as DE #20 is ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/6/2023. All discovery to be completed by 1/16/2024. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 9/13/2023. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 11/15/2023. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 12/13/2023. The last date for any party to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings is 6/12/2023. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 3 day jury trial by February 2024. Mediator Selection Deadline is 3/1/2023. All other agreements of the parties concerning discovery are adopted. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/29/2022. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. (Tape #ATT HOST 2.) (tc)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ellis, Asia)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ellis, Asia)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by MVS Transport LLC, Gerson Molina Guevara, R&L Freight.(Ellis, Asia)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2022 09:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/4/2022. (tc)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Schafer on behalf of Joseph Honkisz (Schafer, Timothy)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Jurisdictional Stmt Deadline terminated. (mlc)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT filed by MVS Transport LLC, Gerson Molina Guevara, R&L Freight. (Pfleging, Lesley)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Schafer, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schafer, Timothy)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Schafer, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schafer, Timothy)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd S Schafer on behalf of Joseph Honkisz (Schafer, Todd)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS Defendants to FILE, on or before 10/31/2022, a supplemental jurisdictional statement properly alleging the citizenship of each party according to the legal principles as stated in this opinion and order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/18/2022. (mrm)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/17/2022. (tc)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nae)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #4 MVS Transport, LLC, R&L Freight, and Gerson Molina Guevara answer due 11/10/2022. (nae)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Asia L Ellis on behalf of All Defendants (Ellis, Asia)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MVS TRANSPORT, LLC, R&L FREIGHT, LLC. (Pfleging, Lesley)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by GERSON MOLINA GUEVARA, MVS TRANSPORT, LLC, R&L FREIGHT, LLC of Automatic Initial Extension of Time (Pfleging, Lesley)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GERSON MOLINA GUEVARA, MVS TRANSPORT, LLC, R&L FREIGHT, LLC. (Pfleging, Lesley)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A Pfleging on behalf of All Defendants (Pfleging, Lesley)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5048544.) from Tippecanoe Superior Court, Cause No. 79D01-2209-CT-000135, filed by GERSON MOLINA GUEVARA, R&L FREIGHT, LLC, MVS TRANSPORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement State Court Record, #3 Supplement State Court Complaint)(Pfleging, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honkisz v. MVS Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HONKISZ
Represented By: Timothy S Schafer
Represented By: Timothy S Schafer, II
Represented By: Todd S Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVS TRANSPORT, LLC
Represented By: Asia L Ellis
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L FREIGHT, LLC
Represented By: Asia L Ellis
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERSON MOLINA GUEVARA
Represented By: Asia L Ellis
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVS Transport LLC
Represented By: Asia L Ellis
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L Freight
Represented By: Asia L Ellis
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?