Rigsby v. John W. Darnell, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Rigsby
Defendant: John W. Darnell, Inc. doing business as All Seasons Roofing and All Seasons Restoration LLC doing business as All Seasons Roofing and Restoration
Case Number: 4:2024cv00023
Filed: March 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Seasons Restoration LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sej)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Seasons Restoration LLC d/b/a All Seasons Roofing and Restoration, filed by Aaron Rigsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Video, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringing Use of Video, #3 Proposed Summons)(Sanders, Craig)
March 18, 2024 Filing 3 Remark: AO 121 Form submitted and emailed to Copyright Office. (rmf)
March 15, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John W. Darnell, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
March 15, 2024 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (rmf)
March 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John W. Darnell, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5517495.), filed by Aaron Rigsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Video, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of Video, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sanders, Craig) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2024: #5 AO 121 Form) (rmf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby v. John W. Darnell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Rigsby
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Darnell, Inc. doing business as All Seasons Roofing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Seasons Restoration LLC doing business as All Seasons Roofing and Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?