BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC.

Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS, MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE, BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 INDIANA/KENTUCKY, INDIANA BRICKLAYERS LOCAL 4 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING COMMITTEE, INDIANAPOLIS PENSION FUND and BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND
Defendant: MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01315
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF JUDGMENT IN SUM CERTAIN, filed by Plaintiffs BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 INDIANA/KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, INDIANA BRICKLAYERS LOCAL 4 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING COMMITTEE, INDIANAPOLIS PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Richard Wolf, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Donald) Modified on 7/3/2019 (MRI).
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT re #7 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC. Copy to May Refractory & Linings via U.S. mail. Signed by Clerk, Laura A. Briggs. (JDH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiffs BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 INDIANA/KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, INDIANA BRICKLAYERS LOCAL 4 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING COMMITTEE, INDIANAPOLIS PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Donald)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 INDIANA/KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, INDIANAPOLIS PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES, INDIANA BRICKLAYERS LOCAL 4 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING COMMITTEE. MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC. served on 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service of Summons and Complaint)(Schwartz, Donald)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC. (REO)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald D. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiffs BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 INDIANA/KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, INDIANA BRICKLAYERS LOCAL 4 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING COMMITTEE, INDIANAPOLIS PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES. (Schwartz, Donald)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC., filed by BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 INDIANA/KENTUCKY, BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND, INDIANAPOLIS PENSION FUND, STEPHEN KNOWLES, INDIANA BRICKLAYERS LOCAL 4 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING COMMITTEE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5363056) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Schwartz, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAY REFRACTORY & LININGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA STATE COUNCIL OF PLASTERERS AND CEMENT MASONS HEALTH AND WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCCLESKEY, TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS AND TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN KNOWLES
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 4 INDIANA/KENTUCKY
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA BRICKLAYERS LOCAL 4 JOINT APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING COMMITTEE
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANAPOLIS PENSION FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL HEALTH FUND
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?