SCHMITZ et al v. MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: JUAN RAMOS, ANNA SVEC, JOHN M. SCHMITZ and GOLDA BOU
Defendant: MYLA ELVIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, CONNIE LAWSON and MYLA ELDRIDGE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03314
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MYLA ELDRIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS.(Bowman, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 29 ENTRY Denying Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction - Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. #10 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/5/2019. (TRG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for hearing held before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/29/2019: Parties appeared by counsel. Argument heard. This matter was taken under advisement and the Court will issue an expedited ruling. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (Court Reporter David Moxley.)(TRG)
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendants MYLA ELDRIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS (Bowman, Daniel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY in Support of Motion re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 Proposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs GOLDA BOU, JUAN RAMOS, JOHN M. SCHMITZ, ANNA SVEC. (Small, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Austin Rowlett on behalf of Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (Rowlett, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (Garn, Jefferson)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Defendants MYLA ELDRIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brienne Delaney, #2 Exhibit A to Delaney Declaration - CAN-1 Form, #3 Exhibit B to Delaney Declaration - Minor Party Candidates, #4 Exhibit 2 - July 30, 2019 Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Michele Cash)(Ricchiuto, Anne)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Boxell on behalf of Defendants MYLA ELDRIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Boxell, Stephanie)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 8/14/2019. The briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #10 ) shall be as follows: A. Defendants' Response shall be filed by August 21, 2019. B. Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed by August 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER - The Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #10 ) is set for oral argument on August 29, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 344, Birch Bayh Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis, Indiana. Parties are allotted thirty minutes each, for a total of one hour. The Court notes that because Defendant Myla Eldridge's name is spelled incorrectly as Myla Elvidge in the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ), her name is spelled incorrectly on the docket. The Clerk is directed to use the correct spelling, Eldridge, on the docket. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/15/2019. (NAD)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/12/2019.(TMB)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #10 ). Parties are to meet with Magistrate Judge Brookman to discuss an expedited discovery plan, briefing schedule, and to discuss a date for the hearing on preliminary injunctive relief, as well as the estimated time required for such hearing. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/12/2019.(NAD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Parvinder Kaur Nijjar on behalf of Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (Nijjar, Parvinder)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. McClain on behalf of Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (McClain, Rebecca)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Celeste Harrigan on behalf of Defendants MYLA ELVIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Harrigan, Anne)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (Garn, Jefferson)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs GOLDA BOU, JUAN RAMOS, JOHN M. SCHMITZ, ANNA SVEC. (Small, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs GOLDA BOU, JUAN RAMOS, JOHN M. SCHMITZ, ANNA SVEC. (Small, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs GOLDA BOU, JUAN RAMOS, JOHN M. SCHMITZ, ANNA SVEC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 CAN 44 form, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 Schmitz Decl, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Bigelow Decl)(Small, Mark)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Kramer Ricchiuto on behalf of Defendants MYLA ELVIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Ricchiuto, Anne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Bowman on behalf of Defendants MYLA ELVIDGE, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Bowman, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MYLA ELVIDGE, CONNIE LAWSON, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (NAD)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to CONNIE LAWSON. (Small, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MYLA ELVIDGE. (Small, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS. (Small, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Small on behalf of Plaintiffs GOLDA BOU, JUAN RAMOS, JOHN M. SCHMITZ, ANNA SVEC. (REO)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MYLA ELVIDGE, CONNIE LAWSON, MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, filed by JOHN M. SCHMITZ, ANNA SVEC, JUAN RAMOS, GOLDA BOU. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP066137) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHMITZ et al v. MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLA ELVIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: Stephanie L. Boxell
Represented By: Anne Kramer Ricchiuto
Represented By: Anne Celeste Harrigan
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Represented By: Robert Austin Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLA ELDRIDGE
Represented By: Stephanie L. Boxell
Represented By: Anne Kramer Ricchiuto
Represented By: Anne Celeste Harrigan
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN RAMOS
Represented By: Mark Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA SVEC
Represented By: Mark Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M. SCHMITZ
Represented By: Mark Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOLDA BOU
Represented By: Mark Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?