POWELL v. KNIGHT et al
Plaintiff: WILLIE POWELL
Defendant: J. JONES, JASON SERVIZZ, PRETORIUS, RAYMOND KINISON, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR., STANLEY KNIGHT and LELA SANDERS
Case Number: 1:2020cv00983
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff WILLIE POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Dismissing Complaint, and Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Three Dollars and Forty-Two Cents ($3.42). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through May 29, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Mr. Powell's complaint must be dismissed for the reason set forth in the Order. He shall have through May 29, 2020, to show cause why Judgment consistent with this Order should not issue. (See Order). Copy to Willie Powell via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/29/2020.(JDH)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Deficiency, Submission of Trust Statement, filed by Plaintiff WILLIE POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by WILLIE POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through April 30, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff WILLIE POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(AKH)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, J. JONES, RAYMOND KINISON, STANLEY KNIGHT, PRETORIUS, LELA SANDERS, JASON SERVIZZ, filed by WILLIE POWELL. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWELL v. KNIGHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON SERVIZZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRETORIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND KINISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. CARTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LELA SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?