B. et al. v. BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: C. B., D. B. and A. B.
Defendant: BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv02487
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Billingsley, Jessica)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent R. Borg on behalf of Defendant BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Borg, Brent)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Billingsley on behalf of Defendant BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Billingsley, Jessica)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Anthony Manna on behalf of Defendant BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Manna, Andrew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A. B., D. B.. BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION served on 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Kerr, Sonja)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Sonja D. Kerr hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Kerr, Sonja)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (REO)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonja D. Kerr on behalf of Plaintiff C. B.. (Kerr, Sonja)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Marie Michael on behalf of Plaintiff C. B.. (Michael, Catherine)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, filed by C. B.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6199292) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Finding on Eligibility and Order on Case Conference, #2 Exhibit B-Order Vacating Hearing Dates and Ordering Sanctions, #3 Exhibit C-Order on Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit D-Order on Dismissal, #5 Exhibit E-Letter to Counsel Regarding Fees, #6 Exhibit F-Email Amending IEP, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Michael, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. et al. v. BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWNSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew Anthony Manna
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Represented By: Jessica L. Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Represented By: Sonja D. Kerr
Represented By: Catherine Marie Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B.
Represented By: Sonja D. Kerr
Represented By: Catherine Marie Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B.
Represented By: Sonja D. Kerr
Represented By: Catherine Marie Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?