JACKSON v. CARTER et al
Plaintiff: DONALD L. JACKSON
Defendant: NEAL FETZ, FRENCH, ROBERT E. CARTER, THE GEO GROUP, INC., SMITH, OWENS, WINNINGHAM, KEITH BUTTS and S. MORRIS
Case Number: 1:2020cv02493
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIPT #IP071201 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $13.14, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY - granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Thirteen Dollars and Fourteen Cents ($13.14). He shall have through October 30, 2020, to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Failure to pay the initial partial filing fee as directed in this Entry could result in the dismissal of the action for failure to comply with Court orders and failure to prosecute. After the initial partial filing fee is received, the Court will issue a collection order to withhold the balance of the $350.00 filing fee and will also screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/30/2020. (NAD)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Donald L. Jackson, Jr. re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONALD L. JACKSON. (AKH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DONALD L. JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Inmate Trust Account; IDOC All Transaction History Report).(AKH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEITH BUTTS, ROBERT E. CARTER, NEAL FETZ, FRENCH, S. MORRIS, OWENS, SMITH, THE GEO GROUP, INC., WINNINGHAM, filed by DONALD L. JACKSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. CARTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEAL FETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GEO GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD L. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?