SHANNON v. INDIANA DEP'T OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: DANTAVIS LAMARCUS SHANNON
Defendant: GIRDLER, JEREMY JONES, MONEBRAILE, A. STEADHAM, WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC, BALLARD, INDIANA DEP'T OF CORRECTIONS, CAMPBELL and STANLEY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2020cv02537
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 Documents to be Sent via Electronic Notice - re #8 Order, #1 Complaint, #9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk Electronic Notice to IDOC and Wexford. (JDC)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: 1) Lt. Girdler; 2) Sgt. Ballard; 3) Sgt. Monebraile; 4) Sgt. Campbell; 5) A. Steadham, R.N. (RAGS) (JDC)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Screening Complaint, Dismissing Deficient Claims, and Directing Issuance and Service of Process - Indiana Department of Correction inmate Dantavis Lamarcus Shannon commenced this 42 U.S.C. 1983 action on September 30, 2020. Dkt. 1. He was granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis and assessed an initial partial filing fee. Dkt. 5. The partial fee has now been paid, dkt. 7, and the complaint is ready for screening. The clerk is directed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendants Lt. Girdler, Sgt. Ballard, Sgt. Monebraile, Sgt. Campbell, and Nurse A. Steadham. in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint, dkt. 1, applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Order. The clerk is directed update the docket to terminate as defendants the Indiana Department of Correction, Stanley Knight, Wexford of Indiana, and Jeremy Jones. The clerk is authorized to serve the IDOC defendants electronically. Defendant Steadham shall be served by U.S. Mail. Because defendant Steadham is believed to be an employee of Wexford of Indiana, LLC, a copy of this Order and the process documents shall also be served on Wexford electronically. Wexford is ORDERED to provide the full name and last known home address of any current or former employee defendant who does not waive service if they have such information. This information may be provided to the Court informally or may be filed ex parte. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/20/2020.(JDC)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIPT #IP071440 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $54.17, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by DANTAVIS LAMARCUS SHANNON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Granting Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of fifty-four dollars and seventeen cents ($54.17). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). The plaintiff shall have through November 6, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and his custodian. The complaint will be screened following payment of the initial partial filing gee. 28 U.S.C. 1915A. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/5/2020. (JDC)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DANTAVIS LAMARCUS SHANNON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Offender Trust System Transaction History Inquiry). (AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2020: #2 Envelope) (AKH).
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BALLARD, CAMPBELL, GIRDLER, INDIANA DEP'T OF CORRECTIONS, JEREMY JONES, STANLEY KNIGHT, MONEBRAILE, A. STEADHAM, WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC, filed by DANTAVIS LAMARCUS SHANNON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope).(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHANNON v. INDIANA DEP'T OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIRDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONEBRAILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. STEADHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD OF INDIANA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEP'T OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANTAVIS LAMARCUS SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?