FERGUSON v. CITY OF KOKOMO et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH S. FERGUSON
Defendant: CITY OF KOKOMO, USPS and KOKOMO POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 1:2020cv02539
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT in the above-entitled matter. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/6/2020.(NAD)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - The Court determined that the Complaint was deficient and subject to dismissal without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Id. at 4. Mr. Ferguson was given to Friday, October 30, 2020, by which to file an amended complaint. He was instructed that if nothing was filed the Court would dismiss his Complaint without prejudice. The deadline to show cause has passed, and to date, nothing has been filed. Accordingly this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. A final judgment will be issued in a separate order. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/6/2020.(NAD)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY - GRANTING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. For the reasons stated above, Ferguson's Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee (Filing No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Having screened the Complaint, the Court finds it is subject to dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Ferguson is granted leave to file an amended complaint by no later than Friday, October 30, 2020. If no amended complaint is filed by that date, this action will be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/6/2020. (NAD)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH S. FERGUSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF KOKOMO, KOKOMO POLICE DEPARTMENT, USPS, filed by KENNETH S. FERGUSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERGUSON v. CITY OF KOKOMO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF KOKOMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOKOMO POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH S. FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?