BAILEY v. YOUNG et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT L. BAILEY, JR.
Defendant: R. YOUNG, CHANDLER and PIKE TOWNSHIP AMBULANCE
Case Number: 1:2021cv02517
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - The Clerk of the Court received this case into the Southern District of Indiana and assigned it to the Terre Haute Division in error. The Court now orders the Clerk to transfer this cause to the Indianapolis Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana and randomly assign it to the docket of a judge in that division. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 9/24/2021.(TPS)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Initial Disclosures: On or before October 29, 2021; Amend Pleadings: On or before November 29, 2021; Settlement Demand: On or before October 29, 2021; Expert Witnesses: On or before December 28, 2021; Settlement Conference Notice: On or before December 13, 2021; All Discovery must be completed by March 14, 2022. Motions for Summary Judgment: On or before April 12, 2022. (SEE ORDER) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/16/2021.(KAA)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: Plaintiff appeared Pro Se and Defendant appeared by counsel telephonically for an initial pretrial conference on September 14, 2021. The parties discussed a case schedule and the Court will enter a Scheduling Order, by separate order, with deadlines to which the parties have agreed. The Clerk is to include a copy of the Guide to Managing Your Lawsuit After Filing with this Entry for the Pro Se Plaintiff. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on December 7, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss case status. Parties shall attend the status conference by calling 1-877-336-1274 Access Code 4665453 Security Code 221268. This matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on May 5, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. (Eastern), by telephone, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guide to Managing your Lawsuit)(CAG)
September 16, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , filed by CHANDLER, R. YOUNG.(Forbes, Katherine)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Forbes on behalf of Defendant CHANDLER. (Forbes, Katherine)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Make Inmate Available - via Telephone. Warden of Putnamville Correctional Facility ordered to make ROBERT L. BAILEY, JR. Available - via Telephone for court proceeding on 9/14/2021. Putnamville Correctional Facility will provide a call-in number to the Court or call 877-336-1274, Access Code 4665453, Security Code 221268. Copy to Warden via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/16/2021.(KAA)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND DISCUSSING DISCOVERY - Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2022. Discovery due by 3/14/2022. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (SEE ORDER.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/16/2021.(TPS)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. CHANDLER waiver sent on 7/19/2021; R. YOUNG waiver sent on 7/19/2021. (Forbes, Katherine) Modified on 8/16/2021 to update docket text (TPS).
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Forbes on behalf of Defendant CHANDLER. (Forbes, Katherine)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Forbes on behalf of Defendant R. YOUNG. (Forbes, Katherine)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIPT #IP075336 for Initial civil filing fee in the amount of $27.02, paid by Plaintiff. (LMK)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (KAA)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk upon: IMPD OFFICER CHANDLER and INDIANAPOLIS SHERIFF TRANSPORT DEPUTY R. YOUNG. (KAA)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Entry on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Screening Complaint - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #3 , is granted to the extent that he is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $27.02. Plaintiff shall have through August 6, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the Clerk of the district court. The claim against Pike Township is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to remove "Pike Township Ambulance" from the docket. If Plaintiff believes the Court has missed some claim he intended to bring, he must amend his complaint accordingly by August 6, 2021. The Clerk is designated to issue process to Defendants Young and Chandler. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/19/2021. (KAA)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT L. BAILEY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Offender Trust Fund and History)(REO)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CHANDLER, PIKE TOWNSHIP AMBULANCE, R. YOUNG, filed by ROBERT L. BAILEY, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Probable Cause Affidavit)(REO) Modified on 7/8/2021 (REO).
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by ROBERT L. BAILEY, JR located at PUTNAMVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by ROBERT L. BAILEY, JR to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAILEY v. YOUNG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT L. BAILEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. YOUNG
Represented By: Katherine Marie Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANDLER
Represented By: Katherine Marie Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIKE TOWNSHIP AMBULANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?