MCLEAN v. US FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: |
WILLIAM ROBERT MCLEAN |
Defendant: |
US FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, B. R. JETT, WILLIAM ERIC WILSON, C. MCCOY and MICHAEL K NALLEY |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv00128 |
Filed: |
April 3, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Vigo |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Hussmann |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard L. Young |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 11, 2011 |
Filing
206
ENTRY Discussing Motion to Dismiss; The BOP's motion to dismiss 175 is granted. All claims against all parties have now been resolved. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. The conference scheduled for October 12, 2011, is vacated. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/11/2011.(NKD)
|
August 23, 2010 |
Filing
151
Entry Discussing Motion to Reconsider; denying 144 Motion for Reconsideration, (see order for more details). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 8/23/2010. (VS)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing
141
ENTRY directing further proceedings; clerk designated to issue and serve process on Federal Bureau of Prisons (BOP, Marshal for this District shall serve summons with amended complaint and this entry; proceedings directed above do not represent a det ermination that the amended complaint has been screened as required by 28 U. S. C. § 1915 A(b) as to claims asserted against the BOP, but merely the court's determination that the issuance of process is appropriate at this time. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/1/2010.(VS)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing
140
ORDER denying plaintiff's 139 Motion to Compel; plaintiff is entitled to know what filings and rulings have been made in case; plaintiff may seek to be supplied with a copy of docket sheet during upcoming pretrial conferences; if it is determined that he lacks a copy of any materials indicated on docket, he may request from clerk to be supplied with such materials; Counsel for dismissed defendant individuals is requested to arrange for a copy of this Entry to be faxed to institution where plaintiff is confined and to be delivered to him as promptly as possible. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/30/2010. cm (NKD)
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing
15
ENTRY Discussing Amended Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings; plaintiff shall have through 12/02/08 in which to state a plausible basis for any claim pursuant to Rehabilitation Act of 1973 or Privacy Act of 1974 (5 U.S.C. §552a) a gainst any of defendants; no partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to claims resolved in this Entry; clerk is designated to issue process to defendants Warden Jett, Dr. William Eric Wilson, C. McCoy, R.N., and Michael K. Nalley; personal service is required. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/03/08. cm(NKD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?