PASSMORE et al v. INDIANA PAROLE BOARD et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PASSMORE
Defendant: ROBERT CARTER, JR., G.M. HORTH, ERIC J. HOLCOMB, JAMES SHAFFER, THOR R. MILLER, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, T.A. MEDLEY, C.F. MILLER and INDIANA PAROLE BOARD
Case Number: 2:2020cv00586
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DISMISSING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Mr. Passmore's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkts. #2 , #3 , are granted to the extent that he is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Sixty Cents ($7.60). Mr. Passmore shall have through December 30, 2020, to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and the plaintiff's custodian. Mr. Passmore's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The dismissal of his claims shall be without prejudice. Mr. Passmore shall have through December 30, 2020, in which to show cause why Judgment consistent with this Entry should not issue. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/1/2020. (KAA)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by MICHAEL PASSMORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff MICHAEL PASSMORE. (AKH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL PASSMORE. (AKH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Michael Passmore re #1 Complaint by MICHAEL PASSMORE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Motions).(AKH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 SECOND MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL PASSMORE. (AKH) Modified on 11/3/2020 (AKH). Modified on 11/3/2020 (AKH).
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL PASSMORE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Offender Trust Fund. IDOC Transaction History Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order). (AKH) Modified on 11/3/2020 (AKH).
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT CARTER, JR, ERIC J. HOLCOMB, G.M. HORTH, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INDIANA PAROLE BOARD, T.A. MEDLEY, C.F. MILLER, THOR R. MILLER, JAMES SHAFFER, filed by MICHAEL PASSMORE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D).(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PASSMORE et al v. INDIANA PAROLE BOARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CARTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.M. HORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC J. HOLCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOR R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.A. MEDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.F. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA PAROLE BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PASSMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?