BURRIS et al v. CITY OF EVANSVILLE et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS BURRIS, KAREN BURRIS and DONIECIA BURRIS
Defendant: UNKNOWN OFFICERS OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT and CITY OF EVANSVILLE
Case Number: 3:2020cv00163
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
2 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge Richard L. Young is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 3:20-cv-163-JRS-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (JRB)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/17/2020. (TMD)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on October 13, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/13/2020.(AAS)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants CITY OF EVANSVILLE, UNKNOWN OFFICERS OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Vonderahe, Keith)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith W. Vonderahe on behalf of Defendants CITY OF EVANSVILLE, UNKNOWN OFFICERS OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Vonderahe, Keith)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF EVANSVILLE, UNKNOWN OFFICERS OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT. (AAS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Andrew Goodridge on behalf of Plaintiffs DENNIS BURRIS, DONIECIA BURRIS, KAREN BURRIS. (Goodridge, John)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DEPRIVATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS BY STATE LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY AND RELATED STATE LAW CLAIMS against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6078820) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodridge, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURRIS et al v. CITY OF EVANSVILLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS BURRIS
Represented By: John Andrew Goodridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN BURRIS
Represented By: John Andrew Goodridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONIECIA BURRIS
Represented By: John Andrew Goodridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OFFICERS OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Keith W. Vonderahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF EVANSVILLE
Represented By: Keith W. Vonderahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?