Stillmunkes v. Givaudan Flavors Corp., et al -- SEE #529 ORDER TERMING SYMRISE INC - SEE ORDER #531 TERMING FIRMENICH INC
Plaintiff: Vicki Stillmunkes
Defendant: Givaudan Flavors Corp, Doe Defendant 1, Doe Defendant 2, Doe Defendant 3, Doe Defendant 4, Doe Defendant 5 and Doe Defendants 6-20
Intervenor: Shive-Hattery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2004cv00085
Filed: July 6, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Presiding Judge: Paul A Zoss
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Blood and Stillmunkes cases (C07-142 and C04-85) are consolidated for trial on the current trial date for the Blood case of July 20, 2009. The clerk is directed to reassign the Stillmunkes case to the undersigned's docket. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 4/10/09. (des) Modified on 4/13/2009 to note copy faxed to Atty Wandro (des).
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting 463 Motion to Compel; denying 475 Motion for the Removal of the Privileged Status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 4/7/09. (Stigler, Karo)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER denying 430 Motion for Leave to Request Punitive Damages Against Givaudan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 12/10/08. (Stigler, Karo) Modified service to Atty Wandro on 12/11/2008 (lbb).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillmunkes v. Givaudan Flavors Corp., et al -- SEE #529 ORDER TERMING SYMRISE INC - SEE ORDER #531 TERMING FIRMENICH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Stillmunkes
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Givaudan Flavors Corp
Represented By: Amanda M Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendant 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendant 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendant 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendant 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendant 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 6-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Shive-Hattery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?