Cedar Rapids Lodge & Suites, LLC et al v. JFS Development, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cedar Rapids Lodge & Suites, LLC, James T Rymes, Rhonda L Coborn, Michael Coburn, Scott Shisler, Julie Shisler, Pamela J. Cobb Revocable Trust, Raymond Mulford, Theresa A Mulford, Jacob Sailer, Ronald Sailer and Jerred Ruble
Defendant: JFS Development, Inc., John F Seibert, Ted Vosburg, Marc Gabrielson and Lightowler Johnson Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00175
Filed: December 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Presiding Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 255 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Seibert in the amount of $12,176,735.22, with prejudgment interest from December 3, 2009, until the date of ju dgment at the current legal rate pursuant to 28 USC 1961(a), postjudgment interest at the current legal rate pursuant to 28 USC 1961(a) and, once approved by the court, such reasonable attorney fees and costs as Plaintiffs demonstrate in their subsequent fee application. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 10/24/2012. (NEF/copy mailed to DEF Vosburg) (pac)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER re 255 MOTION for Default Entry against John F. Seibert: The court reserves ruling on the Motion for Default Judgment and an evidentiary hearing on the issue of damages to be awarded from John Seibert to Plaintiffs will be held on 9/27/ 2012 8:00 AM Central Time at 4200 C Street SW, Cedar Rapids, Iowa Building B, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Linda R Reade. Because evidence will be presented, telephonic participation by counsel or pro se parties will not be permitted. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 8/28/12. (ksy)(NEF/copy mailed to DEF Vosburg)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 199 Motion for Default Judgment as to JFS Development, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of CRLS and against JFS in the amount of $978.891.39. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 03/05/2012 (NEF/copy to Vosburg via US mail). (skm)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER denying 214 Motion to Reconsider 212 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and to Certify Questions of Law to Iowa Supreme Court (see text of Order for details). Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 2/14/2012 (copy w/NEF mailed to pro se party). (skm)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion for Sanctions against John F. Seibert and granting 205 Motion For Enlargement of Pretrial Deadlines and Continuation of Trial Date. Jury Trial reset for 6/11/2012 09:00 AM in 4200 C Street SW, Building B, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Linda R Reade. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/17/2012 03:00 PM in 4200 C Street SW, Building B, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Linda R Reade (see text of Order for details). Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 01/18/2012 (copy w/NEF to non ECF party via US Mail). (skm)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 194 Motion in Limine. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Lightowler against Plaintiff CRLS. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 1/6/2012. (Copy to Vosburg via US mail) (pac) Modified on 1/6/2012 to indicate service (pac).
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER adopting 183 Report and Recommendations: The 166 Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff's Attorney Robert H. Miller filed by John F Seibert is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 11/30/2011 (copy w/NEF to Dft Vosburg via US Mail). (skm)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER adopting 160 Report and Recommendations to deny 136 Motion for Sanctions against Defendant John F. Seibert filed by Michael Coborn, Raymond Mulford, Cedar Rapids Lodge & Suites, LLC, Jerred Ruble, Scott Shisler, Ronald Sailer, Jacob Sailer, Theresa A Mulford, Pamela J. Cobb Revocable Trust, James T Rymes, Julie Shisler and Rhonda L Coborn. 173 Plaintiffs Objections are overruled and the 136 Motion for Sanctions is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 11/29/2011 (copy w/NEF to Dft Vosburg via US Mail). (skm)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the 166 Pro Se Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff's Attorney Robert H. Miller filed by John F Seibert, be denied. Motions no longer referred to Magistrate Judge 166 Pro Se Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff's Attorney Robert H. Miller. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 11/07/2011 (copy w/NEF to Vosburg via US Mail). (skm)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying 154 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 10/7/2011. (Stigler, Karo) Modified on 10/7/2011 to indicate service to Defendant Vosburg via U.S. mail)(Stigler, Karo).
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Adopting 146 Report and Recommendations re 135 Motion for Contempt filed by Michael Coborn, Raymond Mulford, Cedar Rapids Lodge & Suites, LLC, Jerred Ruble, Scott Shisler, Ronald Sailer, Jacob Sailer, Theresa A Mulford, Pamela J. Cobb Revocable Trust, James T Rymes, Julie Shisler, Rhonda L Coborn. Judgment is entered in the amount of $77,928.68 in favor of Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 10/3/2011. (NEF/copy to Vosburg) (pac)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the 136 Motion for Sanctions against Defendant John F. Seibert filed by Michael Coborn, Raymond Mulford, Cedar Rapids Lodge & Suites, LLC, Jerred Ruble, Scott Shisler, Ronald Sailer, Jacob Sailer, Theresa A M ulford, Pamela J. Cobb Revocable Trust, James T Rymes, Julie Shisler and Rhonda L Coborn be denied. Motions no longer referred to Magistrate Judge 136 Motion for Sanctions against Defendant John F. Seibert. Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 09/27/2011 (copy w/NEF to Vosburg). (skm)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re 132 Notice of Bankruptcy filed by Ted Vosburg. This action is stayed with respect to Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Ted Vosburg. All other claims and counterclaims shall proceed. Defendant Ted Vosburg is ordered to file a Status Report about the status of the bankruptcy proceedings on or before 1/18/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 7/18/2011. (pac)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Plaintiffs' favor on Count II of JFS and Siebert's Counterclaims 78 . Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 01/18/2011. (jls)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anna Rybicki; Brad J Brady and Matthew L Preston terminated; granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines (Plaintiffs' Expert Witness due by 3/1/2011; Def endants' Expert Witnesses due by 5/2/2011; Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Experts due by 6/1/2011; Discovery due by 7/1/2011; Motions due by 7/1/2011; the trial scheduled on 8/22/2011 is continued); denying 89 Motion to Compel. See text of order Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 12/6/2010. (pac)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and granting 65 and 68 Motions to Amend Answer and Counterclaim. The Clerk of Court shall detach and separately file Defendants' Amended Answer and Counterclaim (docket no. 65-1). Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 07/19/2010. (skm)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 50 Plaintiff's Objections are overruled. The 13 Petition to Attach is denied. The 29 Motion to Dismiss Petition to Attach is granted and the 32 Motion to Quash and Dismiss Petition for Attachment is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 04/29/2010. (skm)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Recommending that the 13 Petition to Attach filed by the Plaintiffs be DENIED. That the 29 Motion to Dismiss Petition to Attach filed by the Defendants John F Seibert and JFS Development, Inc., be GRANTED and that the 32 Motion to Quash and Dismiss Petition for Attachment filed by Defendants Ted Vosburg and Marc Gabrielson be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 03/08/2010. (skm)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Confirmation of Non-Evidentiary Nature. Plaintiffs' Petition to Attach will be determined based on the sworn petition and supporting affidavits. The Court will not test the truth of Plaintiffs' allegations in support of the requested attachment. If the statements are not true, then Defendants' remedy is through an action on the bond, pursuant to Iowa Code sections 639.14-.15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/1/2010. (de)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Rapids Lodge & Suites, LLC et al v. JFS Development, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Rapids Lodge & Suites, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T Rymes
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda L Coborn
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Coburn
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Shisler
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Shisler
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Cobb Revocable Trust
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Mulford
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A Mulford
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Sailer
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sailer
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerred Ruble
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFS Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Vosburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Gabrielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightowler Johnson Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?