Sellars et al v. CRST Expedited, Inc
Plaintiff: Cathy Sellars, Claudia Lopez and Leslie Fortune
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc
Case Number: 1:2015cv00117
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Presiding Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 216 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because this order disposes of all pending claims, judgment shall enter in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiffs. The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/15/2019. (src)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 171 Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the class retaliation claim - the class claim of unlawful retaliation is dismissed; granting 172 Motion for decertification of the Hostile Work Environment class - the Hostile Work Environment Class is hereby decertified (See Order text). Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 1/15/2019. (des)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 35 SEALED Motion For Class Certification filed by Claudia Lopez, Leslie Fortune, Cathy Sellars (See Order Text). Plaintiffs counsel of Friedman & Houlding, LLP, and local couns el Thomas Newkirk, are hereby appointed as class counsel for both certified classes. This Order may be altered or amended as appropriate before final judgment pursuant to Rule 23(c)(1)(C). Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/30/2017. (des)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (see text of Order). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 12/8/2016. (skm)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Compel. Defendant must timely respond to the requested discovery for the time period beginning in October 2009. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 9/12/2016. (skm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellars et al v. CRST Expedited, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Sellars
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Lopez
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Fortune
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?