TrueNorth Companies, LC et al v. TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TrueNorth Companies, LC and TrueNorth Principals, LC
Defendant: TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC and William Eskridge
Case Number: 1:2017cv00031
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Presiding Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The 271 Motion to Dismiss is granted. TN Global is hereby dismissed as a party to this suit. The 274 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 250 Order on Motion to Strike is denied. The 295 Motion for Reconsideration/Clarification of the Court's 266 Summary Judgment Order and Opinion is granted in part and denied in part (see text of Order). Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 11/5/2019. (skm)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Denying 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by TrueNorth Principals, LC, TrueNorth Companies, LC. Granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Exclude Expert opinions, testimony and evide nce filed by TrueNorth Principals, LC, TrueNorth Companies, LC (See Order text regarding deadlines for submissions with regard to the alternative sanction of an award). Denying 90 Motion to Amend the Protective Order filed b y TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC. Granting 91 Motion to Extend Certain Scheduling Order deadlines. Defendants Supplemental Expert Witness Report for Christopher King due by 12/17/2018. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Expert Witnesses due by 1/18/2019. Completion of Expert Discovery by 2/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 7/1/2019. Denying 124 Motion to Strike Exhibits Filed by Defendant TrueNorth Principals, LC, TrueNorth Companies, LC. Granting 127 Motion for Leave to supplement resistance to motion for preliminary injunction filed by TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC. Trial remains scheduled for 7/8/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/7/2018. (des)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order granting 50 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count III by Defendant TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America. Count III is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 2/8/2018. (des)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Amend 2 Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall detach, file and docket the proposed amended complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 11/27/2017. (skm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TrueNorth Companies, LC et al v. TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TrueNorth Companies, LC
Represented By: Dana L Oxley
Represented By: Brett David Papendick
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TrueNorth Principals, LC
Represented By: Dana L Oxley
Represented By: Brett David Papendick
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Crane
Represented By: Sharon K Malheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Eskridge
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Crane
Represented By: Sharon K Malheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?