Hesford v. Jefferson Capital System

Plaintiff: Joshua Hesford
Defendant: Jefferson Capital System
Case Number: 1:2018cv00100
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
0 Judge: Mark A Roberts
1 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs)
October 18, 2018 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Jefferson Capital System Responses due by 11/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Lange, Lance)
October 8, 2018 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Capital System identifying Corporate Parent CL Holdings LLC for Jefferson Capital System. (Lange, Lance)
September 17, 2018 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline set for 10/17/2018. Notice/NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)
September 17, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/8/2018. NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)
September 17, 2018 3 DOCKET Annotation - Please find the new removal case packet attached. Mailed to plaintiff with NEF. (src)
September 17, 2018 2 STATE Court Petition by Joshua Hesford. Mailed to plaintiff with NEF. (src)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified with parties, and attorneys Carter & Lange. NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Linn County, case number SCSC234996. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2774480), filed by Jefferson Capital System. Scheduling Report due by 11/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B-E - State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lange, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hesford v. Jefferson Capital System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hesford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital System
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Carter
Represented By: Lance W Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?