JATC Fund v. Knustrom
Plaintiff: Local Union No 125 JATC Fund
Defendant: Clinton Knustrom
Case Number: 1:2018cv00102
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S Default Entry as to Defendant Clinton Knustrom: Granting #7 Motion for Default Entry. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/18. (Copy w/NEF mailed to Defendant Clinton Knustrom) (kfs)
November 13, 2018 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry against Clinton Knustrom by Plaintiff Local Union No 125 JATC Fund (Germaine, Jennifer)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund. Clinton Knustrom served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Germaine, Jennifer)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 (DOCKETED IN ERROR: Attorney to refile): Certificate of Service filed by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund RE: #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Complaint #2 Notice of MJ Assignment #3 Summons and Civil Case Packet) (Germaine, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (kfs)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Local Union No 125 JATC Fund (Germaine, Jennifer)
September 24, 2018 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/15/2018 (kfs)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Defendant Clinton Knustrom****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****(Attachment #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kfs)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge: Check Status ddl 10/24/2018 (kfs)
September 24, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added: No conflicts identified as to judge, parties and attorneys (kfs)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Clinton Knustrom (Filing Fee $400: Receipt Number: 0862-2781269) by Plaintiff Local Union No 125 JATC Fund: Scheduling Report ddl 12/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3) (Germaine, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JATC Fund v. Knustrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No 125 JATC Fund
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Knustrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?