GenoSource, LLC v. Inguran, LLC
Plaintiff: GenoSource, LLC
Defendant: Inguran, LLC dba Sexing Technologies
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Inguran, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Hawkeye Breeder Services, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00113
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Financial Disbursement re #78 Order (jjh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 84 Summons Issued as to Hawkeye Breeder Services, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm) (Main Document 84 replaced on 12/21/2018) (jjh).
December 20, 2018 Filing 83 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint, THIRD Party Complaint against Hawkeye Breeder Services, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against GenoSource, LLC by Inguran, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morales, Angela) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (skm).
December 14, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Filing of Electronic Transcript: Administrative Order attached: Please read for instructions for actions parties/counsel may be required to take re #81 Motion to Compel Discovery Hearing Transcript. (ksy)
December 14, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Motion to Compel Discovery Hearing Proceedings held on 11/27/18, before Judge Mahoney. Court Reporter Shelly Semmler, Telephone number 712 233 3846. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Redaction Request due 1/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2019. (ksy)
December 13, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Filing of Electronic Transcript: Administrative Order attached: Please read for instructions for actions parties/counsel may be required to take re #79 Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration, and Motion for Expedited Discovery. (pac)
December 13, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration, and Motion for Expedited Discovery held on 11/30/2018, before Judge CJ Williams. Court Reporter Patrice A Murray, Telephone number 319-286-2338. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2019. (pac)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #76 Unresisted Motion for Substitution of Surety Bond and Release of Cash Bond by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC: The Clerk of Court is directed to release the cash bond. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/12/2018. (eFinance) (jjh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 77 SEALED Motion Recover on TRO Bond by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration) (Morales, Angela)
December 11, 2018 Filing 76 UNRESISTED Motion for Substitution of Surety Bond and Release of Cash Bond by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hill, Timothy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 75 Surety BOND in the amount of $500,000 posted by GenoSource, LLC pursuant to #73 Order. (Original bond placed in CR Clerk's Office vault) (pac)
December 7, 2018 CASH Bond Proceeds for GenoSource LLC: $500,000.00, receipt number IAN110023747 for Bond pursuant to #73 Order. (jjh) Modified text on 12/19/2018 (kfs)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #69 Resistance to Motion, filed by Inguran, LLC. The transcript at issue (Doc. 69-1) is to remain under seal. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/06/2018. (jjh)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11 ) is granted in part and denied in part, defendants Motion to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration (Doc. #24 ) is denied, and plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery Regarding Scope of Violations of TRO (Doc. #45 ) is denied. The preliminary mandatory and negative injunction that has been issued herein shall go into effect upon plaintiffs payment of a bond to the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa in the amount of $500,000.00. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/06/2018. (jjh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 72 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Inguran, LLC (Morales, Angela)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re #28 Temporary Restraining Order: The Temporary Restraining Order that is currently in effect (Doc. 28) shall remain in full force and effect through December 7, 2018. No additional bond is required for the continuation of the Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/3/2018. (skm)
December 3, 2018 Filing 70 BRIEF in Support re #11 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested Plaintiff's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by GenoSource, LLC. (Hill, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 69 RESISTANCE to Motion re #11 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested Supplemental Brief in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Inguran, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Morales, Angela)
December 1, 2018 Filing 68 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2018 re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration filed by Inguran, LLC, #11 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested filed by GenoSource, LLC, #45 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Expedited Discovery Regarding Scope of Violations of TRO (Expedited Relief Requested) filed by GenoSource, LLC. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Patrice Murray) (sam) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (pac). (Main Document 68 replaced on 12/3/2018 to correct hearing date only) (ksy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #1 Witness and Exhibit List) (pac).
November 30, 2018 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration filed by Inguran, LLC. (Morales, Angela)
November 30, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Filing of Electronic Transcript: Administrative Order attached: Please read for instructions for actions parties/counsel may be required to take re #65 Hearing on Motion for Expedited Discovery Transcript. (ksy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Expedited Discovery held on 11/15/18, before Judge Mahoney. Court Reporter Shelly Semmler, Telephone number 712 233 3846. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2019. (ksy)
November 29, 2018 DOCKET Annotation re #56 Exhibit List, #61 Sealed Exhibits : Bound and tabbed copy received in Clerk's office. (ksy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 64 BRIEF in Support re #11 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested (Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefing) filed by GenoSource, LLC. (Hill, Timothy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 63 RESISTANCE to Motion re #45 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Expedited Discovery Regarding Scope of Violations of TRO (Expedited Relief Requested) filed by Inguran, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Morales, Angela)
November 28, 2018 Filing 62 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2018 RE: #52 Motion to Compel: Motion granted in part and denied in part: No order to follow (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (kfs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 61 SEALED Defendant's Exhibits re #34 Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Inguran, LLC, GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Hearing Exhibits [SEALED] - A thru Z, #2 Defendant's Hearing Exhibits [SEALED] - BB-TT) (Morales, Angela) Modified on 11/29/2018 (ksy).
November 27, 2018 Filing 60 SEALED Plaintiff's Exhibit List and Sealed Exhibits re: #34 Order Setting Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by GenoSource, LLC, Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 28, #14 Exhibit 29, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 31, #17 Exhibit 32, #18 Exhibit 33, #19 Exhibit 34, #20 Exhibit 35, #21 Exhibit 36, #22 Exhibit 37, #23 Exhibit 39, #24 Exhibit 41, #25 Exhibit 42) (Hill, Timothy) Modified on 11/28/2018 (ksy).
November 27, 2018 Filing 59 PLANTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST re: #34 Order Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by GenoSource, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 19, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26, #15 Exhibit 27, #16 Exhibit 38, #17 Exhibit 40) (Hill, Timothy) Modified on 11/28/2018 (ksy).
November 27, 2018 Filing 57 Witness List by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC. (Hill, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 56 Exhibit List Defendant's Witness and Exhibit List re: #34 Order Setting Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Continue Arbitration by Inguran, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Hearing Exhibits [Unsealed] - L, P, V, and AA) (Morales, Angela) Modified on 11/28/2018 (ksy).
November 27, 2018 DOCKET Annotation re #34 Order Setting Hearing on Motion : Hard copy of exhibit list, exhibits and witness list received from Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (ksy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 55 RESISTANCE to Motion re #52 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses filed by GenoSource, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Katherine Garceau) (Hill, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Filing 54 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing on Motion #52 Defendant's Expedited MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses: Plaintiff's Expedited Response to motion due by 11/27/2018 (prior to the time of scheduled hearing). From a review of the filed pleadings, it does not appear that the parties have fully met and conferred as contemplated under Local Rule 37. The parties shall fully meet and confer pursuant to Local Rule 37 prior to scheduled hearing. Expedited Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 11/27/2018 at 4:00 PM (Central), Telephonic Hearing, before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Courts conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the host (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/26/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami)
November 26, 2018 Filing 53 SEALED Document Sealed Declaration of Dennis J. Windscheffel in Support of #52 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses by Inguran, LLC, GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F) (Morales, Angela) Modified text on 11/27/2018 (ksy).
November 26, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration Declaration of Dennis J. Windscheffel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Morales, Angela) Modified text on 11/27/2018 (ksy).
November 26, 2018 Filing 51 PROTECTIVE Order: Granting #49 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/26/18. (kfs)
November 23, 2018 Filing 50 RESISTANCE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration filed by GenoSource, LLC. (Hill, Timothy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order) (Morales, Angela)
November 21, 2018 Filing 48 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Opposition to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Inguran, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B) (Clerk filed per #47 Order). (skm)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition Brief to Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and docket defendant's Supplemental Opposition Brief to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 44-2). When docketing defendant's brief, the Clerk of Court is directed to omit the first page of the attachment that indicates that the brief was submitted to the Court as Exhibit B of defendant's motion (Doc. 44-2, at 1). Consistent with the Court's #46 Order, plaintiff may have through November 28, 2018, to file a supplemental brief on the #11 motion for preliminary injunction, should plaintiff wish to file such a brief. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/21/2018. (skm)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order re #44 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Supplemental Opposition Brief and #45 MOTION for Expedited Discovery Regarding Scope of Violations of TRO. With respect to defendant's motion (Doc. 44), should plaintiff wish to file a resistance, plaintiff may have through today, November 20, 2018, to do so. Should the Court grant defendants motion, plaintiff will then have through November 28, 2018, to file a supplemental brief on the #11 motion for preliminary injunction, should plaintiff wish to file such a brief. With respect to plaintiff's motion (Doc. 45), defendant may have through November 28, 2018, to file a resistance. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/20/18. (ksy) Modified text to add link on 11/21/2018 (skm).
November 20, 2018 Filing 45 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Expedited Discovery Regarding Scope of Violations of TRO (Expedited Relief Requested) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, #2 Exhibit 2 in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, #3 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery) (Hill, Timothy)
November 19, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Supplemental Opposition Brief to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Brief Exhibit B-Defendant's Supplemental Opposition Brief to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Morales, Angela)
November 19, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing of Electronic Transcript: Administrative Order attached: Please read for instructions for actions parties/counsel may be required to take re #42 Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Transcript. (ksy)
November 19, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on 11/9/18, before Judge C.J. Williams. Court Reporter Patrice Murray, Telephone number 319 286 2338. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Redaction Request due 12/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2019. (ksy)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part #33 Motion for Expedited Discovery: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/16/18. (kfs)
November 16, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2018 re #33 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Aid of Injunctive Relief and with Respect to Motion to Compel Arbitration (Expedited Relief Requested) filed by GenoSource, LLC. The motion is taken under advisement - order to follow. (Court Reporter - FTR Gold) (src)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See text of Order. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/16/2018. (jjh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested filed by GenoSource, LLC. (Hill, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 37 Response to Motion re #33 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Aid of Injunctive Relief and with Respect to Motion to Compel Arbitration (Expedited Relief Requested) filed by Inguran, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Windscheffel, #2 Declaration of Steward) (Morales, Angela) Modified on 11/15/2018 (ksy).
November 14, 2018 Filing 36 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by GenoSource, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/02/2018: Action taken pursuant to #9 (kfs)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Hearing on #33 Motion for Expedited Discovery in Aid of Injunctive Relief and with Respect to Motion to Compel Arbitration: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/14/18. (Copy w/NEF mailed to attorney Michael Francis Reeder II) (kfs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #1 Receipt Confirmation) (kfs).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested and #24 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration: Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/14/2018. (skm) Modified on 11/14/2018, copy w/NEF to Reeder(skm).
November 13, 2018 Filing 33 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Aid of Injunctive Relief and with Respect to #24 Motion to Compel Arbitration (Expedited Relief Requested) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion) (Hill, Timothy) Modified text and link on 11/14/2018 (ksy).
November 13, 2018 FEE Receipt: $100.00, receipt number IAN110023592 for Pro Hac Vice filing fee for attorney Dennis Windscheffel re #17 Motion (original receipt mailed to atty Morales). (skm)
November 12, 2018 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for TRO by GenoSource, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
November 12, 2018 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial by GenoSource, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
November 12, 2018 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Mandatory Injunction, and supporting documents by GenoSource, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
November 9, 2018 CASH BOND in the amount of $50,000 posted by TJR Genetics pursuant to #28 Order. (pac)
November 9, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2018 re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GenoSource, LLC. Taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Patrice Murray) (jjh) (Main Document 29 replaced on 11/14/2018 to mark hearing as contested) (pac).
November 9, 2018 DOCKET Annotation re 22 Sealed Appendix, #23 Sealed Brief, #24 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration, #25 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief: Hard copy received in CR Clerk's Office and forwarded to CJW Chambers. (jjh)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting #11 Motion for TRO. This temporary restraining Order shall remain in effect up to and including December 3, 2018. This Order shall issue upon plaintiff's payment of a bond to the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa in the amount of $50,000.00. Plaintiff is directed to serve this Order on all necessary persons and entities, or otherwise ensure that such persons and entities receive actual notice of this Order. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/9/2018. (sam) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (skm).
November 9, 2018 Filing 27 SEALED Brief in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration filed by Inguran, LLC, GenoSource, LLC. (jjh)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Inguran, LLC. The Clerk of Court shall file, under seal, the overlength brief attached at Doc. 25-1. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/09/2018. (jjh) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (jjh).
November 8, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Inguran, LLC, GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Sealed Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration) (Morales, Angela) Modified on 11/9/2018 (pac).
November 8, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration by Defendant Inguran, LLC Responses due by 11/23/2018. (Morales, Angela) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (mmc).
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 SEALED Defendant's Brief in Resistance re #11 Oral Argument Requested - Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested by Inguran, LLC, GenoSource, LLC (Morales, Angela) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (mmc).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 , #17 and #18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Kirt S O'Neill, Dennis Windscheffel and Michael Francis Reeder II on behalf of Defendant Inguran LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/7/2018. (eAtty Reeder with CM/ECF Attorney Registration Form) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #1 Receipt Confirmation) (des).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* ORDER granting #19 Motion to Expedite; granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the declarations of Juan Moreno and Daniel Carroll, the referenced exhibits, and defendant's oppostion briefing to plaintiff's request for a TRO and Motion to Dismiss/Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 11/7/2018. (skv)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 EXPEDITED Relief Requested , MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Morales, Angela)
November 7, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Francis Reeder II ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2810574) by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Morales, Angela)
November 7, 2018 Set Fee Date Deadline: PHV Fee for Attorney Windsheffel due by 11/21/2018. (ksy)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dennis Windsheffel by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Morales, Angela)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kirt S. O'Neill ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2809839) by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Morales, Angela)
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela J Morales on behalf of Inguran, LLC. (Morales, Angela)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Linebaugh on behalf of Inguran, LLC. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
November 6, 2018 DOCKET Annotation re #11 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested : Hard copy received in clerk's office. (ksy)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction: The portion of the motion that addresses the temporary retraining order will come on for hearing on 11/9/2018 at 11:00 AM CST in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5, plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on defendant. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/6/2018. (skm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GenoSource, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Relief Requested by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 2 in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #3 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit A - Butz Declaration, #5 Exhibit B - Rauen Declaration, #6 Exhibit C - Rice Declaration) (Hill, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Rice, granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David G. Jorgensen, granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine A. Garceau, and granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Holly A. Harrison all to appear on behalf of Plaintiff, Genosource LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/5/2018. (src)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GenoSource, LLC. Inguran, LLC served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Hill, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Holly A. Harrison ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2807336) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine A. Garceau ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2807333) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David G. Jorgensen ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2807330) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Rice ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2807324) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by GenoSource, LLC. Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order is denied on the record presently before the Court. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 10/30/2018. (sam)
October 30, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams: Chief Judge Leonard T Strand no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified: Action taken pursuant to instructions from LTS chambers (kfs)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Inguran, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
October 26, 2018 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/15/2018: Scheduling Report due by 01/23/2019 (skm) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (kfs)
October 26, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of GenoSource, LLC. (Carrington, Melissa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Inguran, LLC dba Sexing Technologies (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2801832.), filed by GenoSource, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 1/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hill, Timothy) Modified to correct dismissal deadline to scheduling report deadline on 10/26/2018 (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GenoSource, LLC v. Inguran, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GenoSource, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Hill
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Represented By: Holly Ann Harrison
Represented By: Katherine Anne Garceau
Represented By: Michael Lyn Rice
Represented By: David Gavin Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inguran, LLC dba Sexing Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Inguran, LLC
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Represented By: Dennis Jared Windscheffel
Represented By: Michael Francis Reeder, II
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Represented By: Angela J Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hawkeye Breeder Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?