International Motor Contest Association, Inc. v. Brzezinski Racing Products, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: International Motor Contest Association, Inc. and International Motor Contest Association, Inc
Defendant: Randall C. Brzezinski, Brzezinski Racing Products, Inc., Brzezinski Racing Products Inc and Randall C Brzezinski
Case Number: 1:2018cv00124
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael D Hutchens (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2851579) and #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John E Radmer (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2851593), on behalf of Defendants Brzezinski Racing Products, Inc and Randall C Brzezinski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/17/2019. (pac)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John E. Radmer ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2851593) by Defendants Randall C Brzezinski, Brzezinski Racing Products Inc (Reitz, Kathleen)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael D. Hutchens ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2851579) by Defendants Randall C Brzezinski, Brzezinski Racing Products Inc (Reitz, Kathleen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure) by International Motor Contest Association, Inc (Zaiger, Mark)
December 28, 2018 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2019. (src)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Brzezinski Racing Products Inc (Reitz, Kathleen)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Defendants' Answer with Jury Demand to #1 Complaint, by Randall C Brzezinski, Brzezinski Racing Products Inc.(Reitz, Kathleen) Modified on 12/28/2018 to edit text. (src
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation - AO 120 Trademark form mailed to Director of the U.S. Patent & Trademark Office. (src)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Randall C Brzezinski & Brzezinski Racing Products Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (src)
November 28, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (src)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Randall C. Brzezinski, Brzezinski Racing Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2820896.), filed by International Motor Contest Association, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 2/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zaiger, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Motor Contest Association, Inc. v. Brzezinski Racing Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall C. Brzezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brzezinski Racing Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brzezinski Racing Products Inc
Represented By: Michael D Hutchens
Represented By: Kathleen Li Reitz
Represented By: John Ervin Radmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall C Brzezinski
Represented By: Michael D Hutchens
Represented By: Kathleen Li Reitz
Represented By: John Ervin Radmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Motor Contest Association, Inc.
Represented By: Dana L Oxley
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Motor Contest Association, Inc
Represented By: Dana L Oxley
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?