Lundvall v. Land O'Lakes, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jarrod H. Lundvall and Jarrod H Lundvall
Defendant: Land O'Lakes, Inc. and Land O'Lakes, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00127
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC: Exhibits marked: Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC: Motions in Limine 21 days before FPTC: Jury Trial set for 05/18/2020 at 9:00 AM in Cedar Rapids before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Final Pretrial Conference set for 05/05/2020 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand: Proposed Pretrial Order ddl 05/02/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 01/25/19. (kfs)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 2/28/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 3/28/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 5/28/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 7/19/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 8/30/2019. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Motions due by 11/12/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 5/18/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 1/22/2019. (mmc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Status Conference held on 1/22/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Status Conference set for 01/22/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 01/11/19. (Attachment #1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (kfs)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney on behalf of Land O'Lakes, Inc (Johnson, Karin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Giudicessi on behalf of Land O'Lakes, Inc. (Giudicessi, Michael) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (skm).
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Land O'Lakes, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Land O'Lakes, Inc, Other Affiliate Winfield Solutions, LLC for Land O'Lakes, Inc. (Elgin, Susan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Land O'Lakes, Inc.(Elgin, Susan)
November 29, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/19/2018. (skm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the New Civil Removal Case packet. (skm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Land O'Lakes, Inc, filed by Jarrod H. Lundvall. (skm)
November 29, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Filing re #1 Notice of Removal by Land O'Lakes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. B) (Elgin, Susan) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (skm).
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT Certificate Pursuant to LR 81 by Land O'Lakes, Inc. (Johnson, Karin)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Hardin County, case number LACV101332. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2821705), filed by Land O'Lakes, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 1/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Karin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundvall v. Land O'Lakes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land O'Lakes, Inc.
Represented By: Karin A Johnson
Represented By: Susan Patricia Elgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land O'Lakes, Inc
Represented By: Susan Patricia Elgin
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Represented By: Karin A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod H. Lundvall
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod H Lundvall
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?