SET RESISTANCE & REPLY DDLS WHEN MTN TO DISMISS IS FILED - SEE [18] - SCHED REPORT DUE 14 DAYS AFTER MTN TO DISMISS IS RULED ON
Plaintiff: Shirley Rhodes, Jeremy Karg and Matthew R Lamarche
Defendant: Transamerica Corporation, The Investment Committee of the Transamerica 401(K) Plan, Does 1 - 40, Investment Committee of the Transamerica 401(K) Plan and Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv00134
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randall W. Edwards on behalf of on behalf of Defendants Transamerica Corporation and Trustees of the Aegon USA Inc Profit Sharing Trust. Upon a review of the motion and the certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 2/22/2019. (src)
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Catalina J. Vergara, and #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian D. Boyle on behalf of Defendants Transamerica Corporation and Trustees of the Aegon USA Inc Profit Sharing Trust. Upon a review of the motions and the certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2019. (src)
February 20, 2019 FEE Receipt: $ 300.00, receipt number IAN110024198 for PHV Fee for Attorneys Catalina J Vergara, Randall W Edwards and Brian D Boyle (ksy)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Granting #17 MOTION for Extension to extend and stay deadlines, filed by Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust, and Transamerica Corporation. Motions to dismiss or responsive pleading due 3/18/2019. Resistance to any motion to dismiss due 4/17/2019. Reply (if any) to resistance due 4/24/2019. The deadline to submit a proposed scheduling orderand discovery plan is stayed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 2/20/2019. (src)
February 18, 2019 Filing 17 Joint UNRESISTED Motion for to Extend Deadline for Pre-Answer Motions and Stay Deadline for Submission of Joint Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust (Stone, Wilford)
February 18, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Corporation, Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust (Stone, Wilford)
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian D. Boyle by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (CA), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (DC)) (Stone, Wilford)
February 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randall W. Edwards by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Stone, Wilford)
February 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Catalina J. Vergara by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Stone, Wilford)
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Kooker on behalf of Transamerica Corporation, Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust. (Kooker, Nathan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilford H Stone on behalf of Transamerica Corporation, Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust. (Stone, Wilford)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes. (Field, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys David Hahn Tracey, Alexandra Dianne Harwin, Charles Henry Field, Jr., and David W. Stanford on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeremy Karg, Matthew R. Lamarche, and Shirley Rhodes. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 2/7/2019. (mmc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David W. Stanford ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2864243) by Plaintiffs Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goplerud, J)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles Henry Field, Jr. ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2864241) by Plaintiffs Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goplerud, J)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra Dianne Harwin ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2864231) by Plaintiffs Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goplerud, J)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Hahn Tracey ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2864217) by Plaintiffs Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Goplerud, J)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes. Investment Committee of the Transamerica 401(K) Plan waiver sent on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Bohlman, Brandon)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes. Transamerica Corporation waiver sent on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Bohlman, Brandon)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Defendants Does 1 - 40, The Investment Committee of the Transamerica 401(K) Plan and Transamerica Corporation****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachment #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kfs)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2839219.), filed by Jeremy Karg, Matthew R Lamarche, Shirley Rhodes. Scheduling Report Deadline 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goplerud, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SET RESISTANCE & REPLY DDLS WHEN MTN TO DISMISS IS FILED - SEE [18] - SCHED REPORT DUE 14 DAYS AFTER MTN TO DISMISS IS RULED ON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Rhodes
Represented By: J Barton Goplerud
Represented By: David W Sanford
Represented By: David Tracey
Represented By: Charles Henry Field, Jr
Represented By: Alexandra Dianne Harwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Karg
Represented By: J Barton Goplerud
Represented By: David W Sanford
Represented By: David Tracey
Represented By: Charles Henry Field, Jr
Represented By: Alexandra Dianne Harwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew R Lamarche
Represented By: J Barton Goplerud
Represented By: David W Sanford
Represented By: David Tracey
Represented By: Charles Henry Field, Jr
Represented By: Alexandra Dianne Harwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Corporation
Represented By: Randall W Edwards
Represented By: Catalina J Vergara
Represented By: Wilford H Stone
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Investment Committee of the Transamerica 401(K) Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investment Committee of the Transamerica 401(K) Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Aegon USA, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust
Represented By: Randall W Edwards
Represented By: Catalina J Vergara
Represented By: Wilford H Stone
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Represented By: Brian David Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?