Jannx Medical Systems, Inc v. Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa

Plaintiff: Jannx Medical Systems, Inc. and Jannx Medical Systems, Inc
Defendant: Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa
Case Number: 1:2019cv00016
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Kelly Mahoney
1 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Jannx Medical Systems, Inc (Caves, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #3 , #4 and #5 Motions for Attorneys Hansel H Rhee, Nicole R Woods and Lydia Reback Leave to Appear Pro Hac on behalf of Plaintiff Jannx Medical Systems Inc. Upon a review of the motions and the certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2019. (des)
February 28, 2019 ***Attorneys Hansel H Rhee, Nicole R Woods, Lydia F Reback for Plaintiff Jannx Medical Systems Inc added pursuant to #6 Text Order granting pro hac vice motions. Clerk checked for conflicts - none found. (des)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lydia Reback ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2880941) by Plaintiff Jannx Medical Systems, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caves, David)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole R. Woods ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2880929) by Plaintiff Jannx Medical Systems, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caves, David)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hansel H. Rhee ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2880911) by Plaintiff Jannx Medical Systems, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caves, David)
February 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/4/2019 (des)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
February 11, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorney David Michael Caves - none found. (des)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2869122.), filed by Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 5/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Caves, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jannx Medical Systems, Inc v. Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannx Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannx Medical Systems, Inc
Represented By: Lydia F Reback
Represented By: Hansel H Rhee
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Nicole R Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?