PER #2 ORDER - PLT TO BE SERVED BY EMAIL

Plaintiff: Sarah Courtney Center
Defendant: Catholic Worker House
Case Number: 1:2019cv00028
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12100
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/9/2019. (mmc)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by Catholic Worker House.(Gamez, Paul)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation - New civil case packet is attached. Emailed to plaintiff, sent via certified mail to defendant. (src)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Catholic Worker House filed by Sarah Courtney Center.Scheduling Report due by 6/17/2019. (NEF emailed to plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (src) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2019: #2 Email from Plaintiff) (src).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's office is directed to file Plaintiff's complaint without prepayment of the filing fee, and provide Plaintiff with a new civil case packet. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 3/19/2019. Order/new case packet emailed to plaintiff, order/NEF sent via certified mail with waiver of service of summons, complaint with attachments and new case packet. (src) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #1 Return of Service) (src).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff shall be served with court filings by email at the email addresses listed in her #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 3/5/2019 (copy w/NEF ePlt). (skm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #1 Return Receipt) (skm).
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sarah Courtney Center. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NEF ePlt) (skm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: #3 Return Receipt) (skm).
March 5, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PER #2 ORDER - PLT TO BE SERVED BY EMAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Courtney Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Worker House
Represented By: Paul D Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?