Weems Industries, Inc v. Flexon Industries Corp

Plaintiff: Weems Industries, Inc
Defendant: Flexon Industries Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv00046
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/20/2019 - pursuant to #5 Summons Returned Executed (des)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weems Industries, Inc. Flexon Industries Corp served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Ogden, Dennis)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Weems Industries, Inc (Ogden, Dennis)
April 22, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/13/2019 (des)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: AO 120 Form with #1 Complaint and attachments mailed to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (des)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Flexon Industries Corp. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
April 22, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys - none found. (des)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Flexon Industries Corp (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2922955), filed by Weems Industries, Inc. Scheduling Report Due 7/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Trademark Registration) (Ogden, Dennis) (Main Document 1 replaced with signed document on 4/19/2019) (ksy) Modified text on 4/21/2019 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weems Industries, Inc v. Flexon Industries Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexon Industries Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weems Industries, Inc
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Represented By: Matthew Robert O'Hollearn
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Morgan
Represented By: Brian J Laurenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?