MCC Iowa LLC v. FARR Technologies, LLC

Plaintiff: MCC Iowa LLC
Defendant: FARR Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 15:1125la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by FARR Technologies, LLC (Morehead, Sander)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Answer deadline extended for FARR Technologies, LLC to 7/29/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/27/2019. (jjh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant FARR Technologies, LLC (Morehead, Sander)
June 13, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/6/2019. (skm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MCC Iowa LLC. FARR Technologies, LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Lange, Lance)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by MCC Iowa LLC (Lange, Lance)
May 17, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/6/2019. (skm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FARR Technologies, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 6/16/2019. (skm)
May 17, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
May 17, 2019 Set Deadline: Scheduling Report due by 8/14/2019. Deadline set pursuant to the filing of #1 Complaint (dismissal deadline set in error). (skm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against FARR Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2941404), filed by MCC Iowa LLC. Scheduling Report deadline 8/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lange, Lance) Modified text on 5/17/2019 to correct deadline from dismissal to scheduling report deadline (skm). (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/20/2019 with attorney signed document) (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCC Iowa LLC v. FARR Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCC Iowa LLC
Represented By: Lance W Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARR Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Sander J Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?