Eco Lips Inc v. Blistex Inc
Plaintiff: Eco Lips Inc
Defendant: Blistex Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Granting #13 UNRESISTED Motion for Second Request of Extension for Time to Move or Plead filed by Blistex Inc. Defendant must file its Answer by not later than Thursday, August 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 7/19/2019. (src)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 UNRESISTED Motion for Second Request of Extension for Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Blistex Inc (Collins, Kevin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Blistex Inc (Ehrlich, Burton)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Burton S Ehrlich (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2971605). Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Burton S Ehrlich is authorized to appear on behalf of Defendant Blistex, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019. (pac)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Burton S. Ehrlich ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2971605) by Defendant Blistex Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Collins, Kevin)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; answer deadline extended for Blistex Inc to 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 6/26/2019. (des)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unresisted by Defendant Blistex Inc (Collins, Kevin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J Gayer on behalf of All Defendants. (Gayer, Sarah)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin H Collins on behalf of All Defendants. (Collins, Kevin)
June 24, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/7/2019. (jjh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Eco Lips Inc (Squires, Vernon)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eco Lips Inc. Blistex Inc served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Squires, Vernon)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Complaint and Form A0 120 have been filed with the Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Complaint and Form Mailed) (kms)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Blistex Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (kms)
June 6, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (kms)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Blistex Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2954146), filed by Eco Lips Inc. Scheduling Report due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Squires, Vernon) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eco Lips Inc v. Blistex Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eco Lips Inc
Represented By: Vernon Pellett Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blistex Inc
Represented By: Burton S Ehrlich
Represented By: Sarah J Gayer
Represented By: Kevin H Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?