Sweet v. Pahl
Plaintiff: Tracy Marie Sweet
Defendant: Andrew Pahl
Case Number: 1:2019cv00080
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 09:00 AM before Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/13/2019. (skm)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 10/29/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 12/13/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 1/15/2020. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 3/13/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 4/15/2020. Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Motions due by 6/18/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 11/16/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/12/2019. (mmc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 9/12/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (mmc)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM (Telephonic Hearing - see text of Order for dial-in hearing participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 09/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order and discovery plan). (Gollhofer, Jami)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with jury demand to #1 Complaint, by Andrew Pahl. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Schrock, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David E Schrock on behalf of Andrew Pahl. (Schrock, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tracy Marie Sweet. Andrew Pahl waiver sent on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Jones, Samuel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Pahl. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
July 17, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (des)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Andrew Pahl ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2981342.), filed by Tracy Marie Sweet. Scheduling Report due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Draft Summons) (Jones, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet v. Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pahl
Represented By: David E Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Marie Sweet
Represented By: Samuel E Jones
Represented By: Dana L Oxley
Represented By: Caitlin Leah Slessor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?