International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America v. Schoitz Engineering Inc
Plaintiff: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Defendant: Schoitz Engineering Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00083
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Schoitz Engineering Inc (Weidner, Steven)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Schoitz Engineering Inc.(Weidner, Steven)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A Weidner on behalf of Schoitz Engineering Inc. (Weidner, Steven)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Troy Zeschke on behalf of Schoitz Engineering Inc. (Zeschke, Dustin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America (Petrzelka, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadline pursuant to #4 Summons Returned Executed: Schoitz Engineering Inc., Answer due 9/10/2019. (skm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. Schoitz Engineering Inc served on 8/20/2019. (Petrzelka, Matthew) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (skm).
July 26, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/16/2019 (des)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Schoitz Engineering Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (des)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 8/25/2019. (des)
July 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schoitz Engineering Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2987949.), filed by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. Scheduling Report Deadline 11/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Petrzelka, Matthew) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (ksy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America v. Schoitz Engineering Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schoitz Engineering Inc
Represented By: Dustin Troy Zeschke
Represented By: Steven A Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Matthew J Petrzelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?