Alvarado v. Gardner et al
Plaintiff: Frank Salvador Alvarado
Defendant: Pete Wilson, Nurse Kelly, Dr. Broksek, Nurse Amanda, Brian Gardner, Lt. Sandvick and Lt. Steenblock
Case Number: 1:2019cv00086
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #3 Complaint by Frank Salvador Alvarado. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frank Salvador Alvarado. NEF mailed to filer. (src)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Frank Salvador Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Activity Report) (NEF mailed to Plt) (skm)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff submit certified copy of inmate account statement and amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis thirty days from the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/16/2019. (copy w/nef and IFP form to Plf; copy w/nef to Linn County Atty's Office) (des)
August 15, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to case(assigned in error). Motions referred to Mark A Roberts.(No conflicts identified) (ksy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Frank Salvador Alvarado (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint) (ksy)(NEF tp Plf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. Gardner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Broksek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Amanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Sandvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Steenblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Salvador Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?