Rockwell Collins, Inc v. Quest International Monitor Service, Inc
Plaintiff: Rockwell Collins, Inc
Defendant: Quest International Monitor Service, Inc. d/b/a Quest International, Inc. and Quest International Monitor Service, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00089
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (des)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rockwell Collins, Inc (Hill, Timothy)
September 17, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/12/2019. (pac)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Rockwell Collins, Inc - Proof of Service by Private Process Server (Hill, Timothy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rockwell Collins, Inc. Quest International Monitor Service, Inc served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Hill, Timothy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Collins, Inc (Hill, Timothy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Quest International Monitor Service, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (kms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2019: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Order Directing United States Marshals Service to Serve Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/28/2019. (kms)
August 23, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order Directing United States Marshals Service to Serve Complaint by Plaintiff Rockwell Collins, Inc (Hill, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re: Compensation of Attorney by Rockwell Collins, Inc (Hill, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quest International Monitor Service, Inc. d/b/a Quest International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3005318.), filed by Rockwell Collins, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 11/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hill, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwell Collins, Inc v. Quest International Monitor Service, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell Collins, Inc
Represented By: Timothy J Hill
Represented By: Ryan S Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest International Monitor Service, Inc. d/b/a Quest International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest International Monitor Service, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?