Evans v. Gavin et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Evans
Defendant: Iowant LLC and Dustin Gavin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED Summons Returned Executed on Iowant LLC by Ryan Evans (Squires, Vernon) Modified on 10/29/2019 to fix text and add link to #6 (des)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Referring Motion: The #10 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by Ryan Evans is referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney for further review and submission of a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 10/21/2019. (skm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Iowant LLC which included #9 Clerk's Default Entry. Unable to forward. (src)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dustin Gavin which included #9 Clerk's Default Entry. No forwarding address. (src)
October 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (src)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by Plaintiff Ryan Evans (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment and Injunctive Relief) (Squires, Vernon) Modified on 10/17/2019 to edit text. (src)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S Default Entry as to Defendants Dustin Gavin and Iowant LLC. Signed by Clerk on 10/09/2019. Entry/NEF mailed to defaulted parties. (src)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION for Default ENTRY as to Defendants Dustan Gavin and Iowant LLC by Plaintiff Ryan Evans. (Squires, Vernon) Modified on 10/9/2019 to edit text. (src)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKETED IN ERROR) - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Dustan Gavin and Iowant LLC by Plaintiff Ryan Evans (Squires, Vernon) Modified on 10/9/2019 corrected version at #8 . (src)
September 25, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant, Iowant LLC's, LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/16/2019. (src)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Evans. Iowant LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Squires, Vernon)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Evans. Dustin Gavin served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Squires, Vernon)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - Form mailed to Mail Stop 8, Director of the US Patent & Trademark Office with complaint. (src)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline set for 10/5/2019. (src)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dustin Gavin and Iowant LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (src)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury demand against Dustin Gavin, Iowant LLC filed by Ryan Evans. Scheduling Report due by 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (src)
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified with parties, plaintiff's attorneys and KEM. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Gavin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Evans
Represented By: Vernon Pellett Squires
Represented By: Ryan S Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowant LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?