Prince v. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Mellish Prince
Respondent: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00102
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Set Deadline: Attorney Adam Hoskins CM/ECF registration due by 9/26/2019 (NEF to Plt, eHoskins). (skm)
September 19, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02342. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 9/19/2019 (NEF mailed to Plt, PSLC notified) (skm). NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Iowa. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/19/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Clerk to transfer this case to the Northern District of Iowa.. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/13/2019. (KDS) cc: Prince. Modified text on 9/17/2019 (MKB). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/19/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of Secretary Department of Homeland Security, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hoskins, Adam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/19/2019.]
August 28, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. cc NEF: Prince, with Practice Pointers. (RJE) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/19/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mellish Prince. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/19/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mellish Prince. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Prince. Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mellish Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?