United States of America v. Iiams et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dustin W. Iiams, First Federal Credit Union, Unknown Parties in Possession, State of Iowa, Iowa, State of and Dustin W Iiams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00128
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S Judgment in favor of United States of America against First Federal Credit Union, State of Iowa, and Dustin W Iiams Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2020. (kms)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT AND DECREE of Foreclosure re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Dustin W. Iiams and First Federal Credit Union and Consent Judgment as to State of Iowa. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/15/2020. (kms)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Dustin W. Iiams and First Federal Credit Union and Consent Judgment as to State of Iowa by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration) (Schunk, Jacob)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S Default Entry as to defendants Dustin W. Iiams and First Federal Credit Union. (copy mailed to defaulted parties) Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2020. (jag)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Entry against Dustin W. Iiams and First Federal Credit Union by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Schunk, Jacob)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Answer of Defendant State of Iowa and Consent to Decree ANSWER to Complaint by Iowa, State of.(Esbrook, Jordan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America of Dismissal of Defendant Unknown Parties in Possession (Schunk, Jacob)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Unknown Parties in Possession. (Schunk, Jacob)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Iowa, State of served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Schunk, Jacob)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. First Federal Credit Union served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Schunk, Jacob)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Dustin W Iiams served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Schunk, Jacob) Modified on text 12/9/2019 (des)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Foreclosure Case Packet) (mmc)
November 20, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Dismissal Deadline 3/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schunk, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Iiams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin W. Iiams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties in Possession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Jordan Genevieve Esbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin W Iiams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?