Day v. Cedar Rapids Community School District et al
Plaintiff: Tabitha Day
Defendant: Cindy Fagan, Grant Woood AEA, Cedar Rapids Community School District, Sandra Byard and Grant Wood Area Education Agency
Case Number: 1:2019cv00137
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sandra Byard, Cedar Rapids Community School District, Cindy Fagan and Grant Wood Area Education Agency, filed by Tabitha Day. Scheduling Report deadline 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NEF mailed to Pltf (jjh) Modified to change dismissal deadline to scheduling report deadline and adjust date on 1/21/2020 (skm).
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tabitha Day: The Clerk of Courts Office is directed to file the complaint without prepayment of fees and to serve, via certified mail, the complaint, a copy of this order, and a waiver of service of summons form on the defendants at the addresses listed in the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/17/2020. (copy mailed to Pltf; order, complaint, waiver by certified mail to Defs) (jjh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2020: #1 GWAEA Return Receipt) (jjh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2020: #2 CRCSD return receipt) (jjh).
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Tabitha Day. (received at counter, NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/12/2020 (copy w/ NEF to plt). (kk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tabitha Day. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NEF mailed to plt) (kk)
December 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (kk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. Cedar Rapids Community School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Woood AEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Rapids Community School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Byard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Wood Area Education Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?