McDowell v. Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer McDowell
Defendant: Mary Brobst, Nancy Hill-Davis and Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa
Case Number: 1:2020cv00002
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (kms)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 2/14/20. (djs)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Jennifer McDowell (Mate-Kodjo, Beatriz)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Jennifer McDowell (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support, #2 Exhibit A - Fees, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Leonard Bates, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Beatriz Mate-Kodjo) (Mate-Kodjo, Beatriz)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court; this case is hereby remanded to the Iowa District Court for Linn County. If plaintiff wishes to pursue an award of costs, she may file an appropriate motion with supporting documentation for the amount requested. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 1/21/2020. (copy of file mailed to the Iowa District Court for Linn County) (des)
January 20, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Remand of Case to state court by Mary Brobst, Nancy Hill-Davis, Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa (Wolle, Thomas) Modified on 1/21/2020 to fix text and add link to #4 Motion to Remand (des).
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Jennifer McDowell Responses due by 1/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Mate-Kodjo, Beatriz)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please find New Removal Case Packet attached. (mmc)
January 8, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendant Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/29/2020. (mmc)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Jennifer McDowell. (mmc)
January 8, 2020 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none identified. (mmc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn County District Court, case number LACV094339. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BIANDC-3101483), filed by Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa, Nancy Hill-Davis, Mary Brobst. Scheduling Report due by 3/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Court filings, #2 LR 81 Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wolle, Thomas) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (mmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDowell v. Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer McDowell
Represented By: Beatriz Mate-Kodjo
Represented By: Leonard Edwin Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Brobst
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Hill-Davis
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital, Cedar Rapids, Iowa
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?