Becker v. Linn County, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Scott Becker
Defendant: Linn County Sheriff and Linn County, Iowa
Case Number: 1:2020cv00023
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to case as presider. (No conflicts identified) (ksy)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Linn County Sheriff, Linn County, Iowa.(Craig, Jason) Modified text on 3/6/2020 (skm).
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal, : New Removal Case Packet attached (ksy)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Scott Becker (ksy)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 3/28/2020. (ksy)
February 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts reviewed, none identified. (ksy)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn County, case number LACV094871. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3148953), filed by Linn County, Iowa, Linn County Sheriff. Scheduling Report due by 4/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Rule 81(a) Removal Information Form) (Craig, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker v. Linn County, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Becker
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: David Ronald Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linn County Sheriff
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Represented By: Lindsay Ann Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linn County, Iowa
Represented By: Jason M Craig
Represented By: Lindsay Ann Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?