Levell v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Levell
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv00042
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
April 20, 2020 *** Attorney Arati C Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley terminated. Per email from attorney Arati Furness, attorneys Furness and Matthew McCarley will not be appearing in this case. (skm)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Joint Unresisted Motion to Stay by Defendants: This case is stayed until 10/1/2020, on which date the stay is automatically lifted, without further Court order. Status Report due by 9/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/10/2020. (jjh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steve Schulte on behalf of Plaintiff Stacy Levell. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2020. (kms)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steve Schulte ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3177265) by Plaintiff Stacy Levell (Attachments: #1 Supplement Texas Certificate of Good Standing for Steve Schulte) (Schulte, Steve)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT UNRESISTED Motion to Stay by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 4/9/2020 (kms).
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Fawcett Aden on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Aden, Allyson)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Richard B North, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lederer, Gregory)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Documents received from MDL Court AZ 2:15-md-02641-DGC as to Stacy Levell v Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders, #2 Daubert Orders, #3 Deposition Designation Orders, #4 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #5 Discovery Orders, #6 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #7 Miscellaneous Orders, #8 Motions in Limine Orders, #9 Transfer Order) (eAttys Furness and McCarley) (des)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to Attorneys Arati C Furness and Mathew Ryan McCarley Not Admitted to Practice in the Northern District of Iowa (eAttys Furness and McCarley) (des)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03861. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (eAttys Furness and McCarley) Modified on 3/27/2020 (des)
March 27, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
March 25, 2020 Remark: Case transferred to the Northern District of Iowa via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03861-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16975390 filed by Stacy Levell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levell v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Levell
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?