Obara v. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner: Saidi Obara
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2020cv00070
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00219. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (copy of docket sheet mailed to plaintiff) Modified on 7/29/2020 (des).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring petition for writ of habeas corpus to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. A copy of this order was mailed to Petitioner by Chambers. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 7/27/2020. (NDC) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 7/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A by Saidi Obara re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 7/29/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 7/29/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Saidi Obara. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 7/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obara v. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saidi Obara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?