Clutts v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Edward Clutts, Jr
Defendant: Unknown Marshal, Ty Duncan, Douglas J Strike and Donald W Washington
Case Number: 1:2020cv00080
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Thomas Edward Clutts, Jr. (NEF mailed to Pltf) (mmc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Edward Clutts, Jr. (NEF mailed to Pltf) (mmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #1 Unredacted Motion) (mmc).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Edward Clutts, Jr: Plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 8/18/2020. (order and IFP form mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Ty Duncan, Douglas J Strike, Unknown Marshal, Donald W Washington, filed by Thomas Edward Clutts, Jr. Dismissal Deadline 11/18/2020 (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #1 Sealed Exhibits) (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clutts v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Edward Clutts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J Strike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?