Tyson v. Reynolds
Plaintiff: James Charles Tyson, Sr
Defendant: Kim Reynolds
Case Number: 1:2020cv00081
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of USCA as to #3 Pro Se Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by James Charles Tyson, Sr: The Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (no documents to forward) (jjh)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of USCA as to #3 Pro Se Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by James Charles Tyson, Sr: Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due October 2, 2020.(jjh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 USCA Case Number 20-2825 for #3 Pro Se Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by James Charles Tyson, Sr. (jjh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #3 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Case Number due by 9/4/2020. (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal as to #2 Initial Review Order, by James Charles Tyson, Sr. (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Charles Tyson Sr. Plaintiff pay the full $400 filing fee by 9/20/2020 or this case will be dismissed with no further order of the court. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/21/2020. (copy w/nef mailed to plaintiff) (des)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Charles Tyson, Sr (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (NEF mailed to Pltf) (PSLC) (jjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Charles Tyson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?